Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Human Papillomavirus Vaccine - Information and Informed Consent
Sponsored by
Senator West
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a health care provider, before each administration of a human papillomavirus vaccine, to provide an individual with a certain information sheet and obtain written consent on a certain form; requiring that a certain information sheet include, at a minimum, certain statements; requiring that a certain consent form developed by the Maryland Department of Health include certain information; requiring the Department to adopt certain regulations; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1332
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
21
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Public Health - Human Papillomavirus Vaccine - Information and Informed Consent
Senate 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 21
Senate 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-341 through 18-344 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM