Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Department of Labor - Clean Energy Workforce Account - Grants
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Labor to administer the Clean Energy Workforce Account; requiring the Department to award grants from the Account in accordance with certain provisions of law; requiring the Department to develop certain application guidelines; and requiring the Department, in developing the application guidelines, to provide opportunity for certain individuals involved with certain programs to review and comment on the guidelines and incorporate certain comments into the guidelines.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1218
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Department of Labor - Clean Energy Workforce Account - Grants
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Department of Labor - Clean Energy Workforce Account - Grants
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:20 PM