Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a limitation on claiming the income tax credit for eligible long-term care insurance premiums for more than 1 year with respect to the same insured individual; altering the amount of the credit from a one-time $500 credit to a maximum of $250 for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2020, but before January 1, 2023, and a maximum of $500 for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2022; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2020.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1365
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0650 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/12/2020 8:59 AM