Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax – Credits for Preceptors in Areas With Health Care Workforce Shortages
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
In the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a credit against the State income tax for certain individuals who serve as certain community-based faculty clinicians for a certain clerkship approved by the Maryland Department of Health; requiring the Department on application of a taxpayer, to issue a tax credit certificate under certain circumstances; requiring the Department to approve applications on a first-come, first-served basis; limiting to $100,000 the total amount of tax credit certificates that may be issued by the Department; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Credit for Community-Based Faculty Clinicians
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {609336/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
49
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax - Credit for Community-Based Faculty Clinicians
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Favorable with Amendments {609336/1 Adopted 47A
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Income Tax – Credits for Preceptors in Areas With Health Care Workforce Shortages
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 49
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Ways and Means 49
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-751 )
Last Updated: 3/23/2020 8:54 AM