Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Commission on Kidney Disease - Membership - Revisions
Sponsored by
Senators Hayes and Lam
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 505
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting certain members of the State Commission on Kidney Disease from having direct ownership of more than 30%, rather than any, in renal dialysis or kidney transplant centers that do business in the State; and reducing the minimum number of names, from 3 to 2, required to be on certain lists submitted to the Governor by certain organizations from which the Governor will appoint certain members of the Commission.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Commission on Kidney Disease - Membership - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Commission on Kidney Disease - Membership - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {836681/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - State Commission on Kidney Disease - Membership - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 505
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - State Commission on Kidney Disease - Membership - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - State Commission on Kidney Disease - Membership - Revisions
Senate 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable Adopted 38
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Second Reading Passed 38
Text - Third - State Commission on Kidney Disease - Membership - Revisions
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 40
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Referred Health and Government Operations 42
House 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments {836681/1 Adopted 60
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 61
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Commission on Kidney Disease - Membership - Revisions
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 505
Text - Chapter - State Commission on Kidney Disease - Membership - Revisions
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM