Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cecil County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds
Sponsored by
Senators Gallion and Hershey
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing from 33% to 40% the percentage of the proceeds from video lottery terminals at the Cecil County video lottery facility that are paid to the video lottery operation licensee of the facility; and requiring that 7% of the proceeds from video lottery terminals at the facility be spent on specified marketing, advertising, and promotional costs and capital improvements at the facility as a condition of receiving the additional proceeds.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0859
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Cecil County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Cecil County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds
Senate 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2021 2/19/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/19/2021 2/19/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:22 PM
Click to return on the top page