Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Policy on Student Concerns About Athletic Programs and Activities
Sponsored by
Senators Hayes and Guzzone
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 507
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each institution of higher education to develop and adopt a policy on student concerns about athletic programs and activities that meets certain requirements on or before October 1, 2019; requiring each institution of higher education to post the policy and any changes to the policy on the institution's website and to submit the policy to the Maryland Higher Education Commission and certain committees of the General Assembly on or before October 1, 2019; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0876
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (108-30)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 507
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Higher Education - Policy on Student Concerns About Athletic Programs and Activities
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable Adopted 47A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Second Reading Passed 47A
Text - Third - Higher Education - Policy on Student Concerns About Athletic Programs and Activities
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Appropriations 50
House 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Third Reading Passed (108-30) 61
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 507
Text - Chapter - Higher Education - Policy on Student Concerns About Athletic Programs and Activities
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-1601 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM