Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Easy Enrollment Health Insurance Program
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman, Beidle, Carter, Elfreth, Guzzone, Hayes, Kelley, Lam, Lee, Rosapepe, Zucker, Smith, Ellis, Griffith, Kramer, Peters, and Pinsky
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 424
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Easy Enrollment Health Insurance Program to improve data collection on uninsured individuals and to maximize enrollment of eligible uninsured individuals in affordable insurance programs; requiring the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange to establish a Maryland Easy Enrollment Health Insurance Program Advisory Workgroup; requiring the Comptroller to include a certain checkoff, to indicate whether an individual is interested in obtaining minimum essential health coverage, on certain State income tax forms; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0814
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {157975/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {376981/2 Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (123-15)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Easy Enrollment Health Insurance Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 424
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland Easy Enrollment Health Insurance Program
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Maryland Health Insurance Option (Protect Maryland Health Care Act of 2019)
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/20/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments {157975/1 Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2019 3/18/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Health Insurance Option (Protect Maryland Health Care Act of 2019)
Senate 3/21/2019 3/19/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2019 3/17/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2019 3/27/2019 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable with Amendments {376981/2 Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Third Reading Passed (123-15) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Maryland Easy Enrollment Health Insurance Program
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 424
Text - Chapter - Maryland Easy Enrollment Health Insurance Program
(   31-101, 31-201 through 31-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page