Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

SB0802


CH0635

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax - Exemption - Maryland Farm Bureau, Inc.
Sponsored by
Senator Reilly and Anne Arundel County Senators
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 635
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Exempting from the property tax property that is owned by the Maryland Farm Bureau, Inc., and used exclusively for education of the public, encouraging agriculture in the State, assisting in the dissemination of information relating to agriculture, or the maintenance of a natural or recreational area for public use; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2020; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0889
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Property Tax - Exemption - Maryland Farm Bureau, Inc.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Property Tax - Exemption - Maryland Farm Bureau, Inc.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-3)
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 635
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Property Tax - Exemption - Maryland Farm Bureau, Inc.
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable Adopted 35
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Second Reading Passed 35
Text - Third - Property Tax - Exemption - Maryland Farm Bureau, Inc.
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 37
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Referred Ways and Means 38
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (130-3) 51A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 635
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:37 PM