Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Charles County - Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officers
Sponsored by
Senator Ellis
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of Charles County to grant, by law, a property tax credit against the county property tax imposed on a dwelling located in the county that is owned by a certain public safety officer; requiring the credit to equal 50% of the property tax imposed on the dwelling; authorizing the governing body of Charles County to provide, by law, for certain matters relating to the credit; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2020; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Charles County - Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officers
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Charles County - Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officers
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Charles County - Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officers
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable Adopted 35
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Second Reading Passed 35
Text - Third - Charles County - Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officers
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 37
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Referred Ways and Means 38
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:21 PM