Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Joint Committee on Gaming Oversight – Local Government Use of Casino Revenue and Problem Gambling Fund – Report
Sponsored by
Senators Patterson and Benson
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Joint Committee on Gaming Oversight to study the development and implementation of certain multiyear plans and the use of the Problem Gambling Fund; requiring the Committee to report its findings to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2019; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1416
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {299237/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Joint Committee on Gaming Oversight - Local Government Use of Casino Revenue - Report
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments {299237/1 Adopted 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Joint Committee on Gaming Oversight – Local Government Use of Casino Revenue and Problem Gambling Fund – Report
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Ways and Means 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page