Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Unemployment Insurance – Computation of Earned Rate of Contribution – Applicable Table of Rates
Sponsored by
Senators Hershey, Klausmeier, Kelley, Augustine, Beidle, Benson, Feldman, Hayes, Jennings, Kramer, and Ready
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 73
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor, based on the availability of certain federal funds, to include in the annual budget bill for fiscal year 2022 a certain appropriation to the Unemployment Insurance Trust Fund; authorizing the appropriation to be used for certain administrative costs, including the repayment of certain federal funds; and requiring that the earned rate of contributions for calendar year 2023 be calculated using a certain table of unemployment insurance rates.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {587071/1 Adopted
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
4/06/2021
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
4/06/2021
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
4/08/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/13/2021
Legislative Date
4/13/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 73
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Unemployment Insurance – Computation of Earned Rate of Contribution – Applicable Table of Rates
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/02/2021 3/12/2021 Favorable with Amendments {587071/1 Adopted 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2021 3/12/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Unemployment Insurance – Computation of Earned Rate of Contribution – Applicable Table of Rates
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2021 3/20/2021 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 4/06/2021 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 4/06/2021 4/06/2021 Hearing 4/07 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 4/08/2021 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Returned Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/13/2021 4/13/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 73
Last Updated: 4/14/2021 10:06 AM
Click to return on the top page