Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Limited Distillery License
Sponsored by
Senator Reilly
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a Class 9 limited distillery license in Anne Arundel County; providing that the State Comptroller issue the license only to a holder of a Class D beer, wine and liquor license in the county for use on the premises for which the Class D license was issued; authorizing a holder of a Class 9 license to establish and operate a plant for distilling, rectifying, and bottling brandy, rum, whiskey, alcohol, and neutral spirits under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {974636/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
57
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/19/2015 2/20/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/05/2015 3/06/2015 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/26/2015 3/27/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2015 3/24/2015 Favorable with Amendments {974636/1 Report Adopted 51
Senate 3/27/2015 3/24/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
Senate 3/30/2015 3/25/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 52
House 3/31/2015 3/27/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 57
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-201, 2-202.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM