Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Independent Living Tax Credit Act
Sponsored by
Senators Peters, Currie, Feldman, Guzzone, King, and Manno
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing an individual or a corporation a credit against the State income tax equal to 50% of the renovation or construction costs incurred during the taxable year to provide specified accessibility and visibility features to or within a home; providing that the credit may not exceed $5,000; requiring applicants to file a specified application before a specified date and to file an amended return; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2016; etc .
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0371
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/09/2016 Text - First - Independent Living Tax Credit Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-737 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM