Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages Inspectors - Qualifications, Powers, and Duties
Sponsored by
Senator Hershey
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying that an alcoholic beverages inspector in Queen Anne's County or any member of the inspector's immediate family may not have a personal or financial interest, directly or indirectly, in a license, license holder, or licensed premises; specifying the powers and duties of an alcoholic beverages inspector in Queen Anne's County; requiring the Queen Anne's County Office of the Sheriff to enforce specified violations; providing that an inspector has no power of arrest; and requiring an inspector to take a specified oath.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0729
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages Inspectors - Qualifications, Powers, and Duties
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable Adopted 38
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Second Reading Passed 38
Text - Third - Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages Inspectors - Qualifications, Powers, and Duties
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 40
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Economic Matters 43
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/27/2017 3/22/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 57
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90
Text - Chapter - Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages Inspectors - Qualifications, Powers, and Duties
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   27-102, 27-205 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM