Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Weekly Benefit Amount - Income Disregard
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier (Chair, Joint Committee on Unemployment Insurance Oversight)
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 53
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing to $200 the maximum amount of wages disregarded when computing the weekly benefit amount to be paid to an unemployment insurance benefits claimant; and terminating the Act on the date that the COVID-19 pandemic ends under Title 14 of the Public Safety Article.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB1139
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Unemployment Insurance - Weekly Benefit Amount - Income Disregard
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {337971/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Unemployment Insurance - Weekly Benefit Amount - Income Disregard
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
32AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (104-32)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 53
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Unemployment Insurance - Weekly Benefit Amount - Income Disregard
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Unemployment Insurance - Weekly Benefit Amount - Income Disregard
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Favorable with Amendments {337971/1 Adopted 28AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Unemployment Insurance - Weekly Benefit Amount - Income Disregard
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Referred Economic Matters 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2021 3/29/2021 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/29/2021 3/13/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 32AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/15/2021 Third Reading Passed (104-32) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Returned Passed 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 53
Text - Chapter - Unemployment Insurance - Weekly Benefit Amount - Income Disregard
Last Updated: 4/15/2021 2:18 PM
Click to return on the top page