Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Sponsored by
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee (By Request - Departmental - University System of Maryland)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Approving specified projects for the acquisition, development, and improvement of specified academic facilities for the University System of Maryland; authorizing the University System of Maryland to issue bonds in a total principal amount of $17,000,000 to finance and refinance specified renewal projects; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1182
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/19/2015 2/20/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/05/2015 3/06/2015 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Hearing 3/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM