Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
District Court of Maryland Employees - Collective Bargaining
Sponsored by
Senator Pugh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing collective bargaining rights for specified employees of the District Court of Maryland; establishing a State Judicial Employees Labor Relations Board; providing for the composition, chair, staffing, powers, and duties of the Board; providing for the staggering of terms of the members of the Board; requiring the Board to recognize one statewide bargaining unit; requiring the Board to adopt specified regulations; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1292
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page