Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
HIV Prevention Drugs – Dispensing by Pharmacists and Insurance Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator Lam
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing pharmacists to dispense a 30-day supply, but no more than a 60-day sypply, of preexposure prophylaxis for HIV prevention to a patient without a prescription under certain circumstances; requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program to provide certain drugs for HIV prevention subject to certain conditions; prohibiting certain insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations from requiring prior authorization for certain drugs for HIV prevention; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021, January 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Text - First - HIV Prevention Drugs – Dispensing by Pharmacists and Insurance Requirements
Senate 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
(   15-856 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:25 PM
Click to return on the top page