Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Procurement - Emergency and Expedited Procurements - Revisions and Reporting
Sponsored by
Senator Lam
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Special Secretary of the Governor's Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs, in consultation with the Secretary of Transportation and the Attorney General, to establish guidelines for each unit to consider when determining the appropriate minority business enterprise participation percentage goal and outreach for an emergency procurement contract; specifying when a unit is required to publish notice of a certain emergency procurement in eMaryland Marketplace; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1091
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021, October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Emergency and Expedited Procurements – Reform
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
4/08/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {344338/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-2)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
4/10/2021
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
4/12/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/28/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (117-11)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Emergency and Expedited Procurements – Reform
Senate 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 4/08/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable with Amendments {344338/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Procurement - Emergency and Expedited Procurements - Revisions and Reporting
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-2) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 4/10/2021 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 4/12/2021 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/12/2021 3/28/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/29/2021 Third Reading Passed (117-11) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Returned Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/14/2021 10:10 AM
Click to return on the top page