Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Charles County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class 4 Limited Winery License
Sponsored by
Charles County Senators
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 544
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting a holder of a Class 4 limited winery license from a certain restriction on interactions with retailers in Charles County; and authorizing a holder of a Class 4 limited winery license to have a financial interest in a certain other license in Charles County.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1018
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2021
Legislative Date
3/28/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-1)
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 544
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Charles County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class 4 Limited Winery License
Senate 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2021 3/16/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2021 2/26/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Charles County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class 4 Limited Winery License
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 28AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Referred Economic Matters 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/28/2021 3/28/2021 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/30/2021 3/14/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/15/2021 Third Reading Passed (133-1) 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Returned Passed 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 544
Text - Chapter - Charles County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class 4 Limited Winery License
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:17 PM
Click to return on the top page