Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners Disciplinary Process and Actions Task Force
Sponsored by
Senators Beidle and Elfreth
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the State Board of Dental Examiners Disciplinary Process and Actions Task Force; providing for the composition and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding revisions to the disciplinary process and actions of the State Board of Dental Examiners that are necessary to improve the process of disciplining dentists in the State and the disclosure of disciplinary actions; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {644338/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
4/07/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {326588/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Board of Dental Examiners - Disciplinary Action - Disclosure Requirements and Licensee Profiles
Senate 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Favorable with Amendments {644338/1 Adopted 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Board of Dental Examiners Disciplinary Process and Actions Task Force
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Referred Health and Government Operations 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2021 3/26/2021 Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 4/07/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Favorable with Amendments {326588/1 Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2021 3/22/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/23/2021 Senate Concurs House Amendments 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/23/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/23/2021 Passed Enrolled
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/13/2021 11:35 AM
Click to return on the top page