Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Licensed Statewide Caterers - Exemption
Sponsored by
Senators Peters, King, and Miller
Status
In the Senate - Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing an exemption from the sales and use tax for the sale of certain materials and supplies to a licensed statewide caterer if, under certain circumstances, the materials and supplies will be used by the caterer to perform a catering contract; requiring the holder of the statewide caterer's license to apply to the Comptroller for an exemption certificate in order to qualify for the exemption; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1023
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Licensed Statewide Caterers - Exemption
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Licensed Statewide Caterers - Exemption
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-236 )
Last Updated: 2/26/2020 4:38 PM