Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Maryland Corps Program Fund - Alterations
Sponsored by
Senators Ferguson and Hettleman
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the purpose and authorized uses of the Maryland Corps Program Fund to include covering expenses incurred to study certain matters and providing funding to match certain gifts or grants; requiring, in fiscal year 2021 and each fiscal year thereafter, funds for the Maryland Corps Program to be as provided in the State budget to cover certain additional expenses; and requiring, for fiscal year 2022 and each fiscal year thereafter, the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of $150,000 to the Fund.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1016
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Higher Education - Maryland Corps Program Fund - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Higher Education - Maryland Corps Program Fund - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - Higher Education - Maryland Corps Program Fund - Alterations
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/05/2020 3/05/2020 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Favorable Adopted 41
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Second Reading Passed 41
Text - Third - Higher Education - Maryland Corps Program Fund - Alterations
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 43
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Appropriations 44
House 3/10/2020 3/10/2020 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 49A
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 51A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/23/2020 8:47 AM