Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sprinkler System Requirements - Tents - Exemption
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that, notwithstanding any other provision of law, a tent is not required to have a sprinkler system if the tent is not used for lodging, serviced by a public water system, and attached to or incorporated as part of a building that is required to have a sprinkler system; defining a specified term; making the Act an emergency measure; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB1179
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/23/2015 2/23/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/05/2015 3/06/2015 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/20/2015 3/23/2015 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-204.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM