Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Retail Service Station Dealers - Gas Prices - Required Signage
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the information about a specified measurement of specified gasoline that must be stated on a sign on the premises of a retail service station dealer to require the highest price, or the cash price and the credit price, be stated in a clear and visible manner; authorizing a specified sign to state the highest price for a specified measurement of specified other motor fuel products; and repealing a specified exemption from a specified signage requirement for specified retail service station dealers.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1127 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Retail Service Station Dealers - Gas Prices - Required Signage
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Retail Service Station Dealers - Gas Prices - Required Signage
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Unfavorable Report by Finance
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM