Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Green Career Gender and Minority Empowerment and Training Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Senator McCray
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to establish, subject to the availability of funds, the Green Career Gender and Minority Empowerment and Training Pilot Program on or before January 1, 2020, to encourage young women and minorities to pursue green careers; requiring the Mayor and City Council to take certain actions under the Program; authorizing the Mayor and City Council to coordinate with fiscal sponsors; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Baltimore City - Green Career Gender and Minority Empowerment and Training Pilot Program
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM