Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Immigration Detention - Prohibition (Dignity Not Detention Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Sydnor, Augustine, Carter, Ellis, Hayes, Kagan, Lee, Patterson, Pinsky, Smith, Washington, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Stating certain findings of the General Assembly; prohibiting certain governmental entities from entering into agreements facilitating immigration-related detention by private entities; prohibiting governmental entities from entering into certain agreements to house immigration-related detainees; requiring governmental entities to terminate existing contracts for the detention of immigration-related detainees not later than October 1, 2021; and making the provisions of the Act severable.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0677
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Correctional Services - Immigration Detention - Prohibition (Dignity Not Detention Act)
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 7/13/2020 3:55 PM