Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Frederick County Board of Education – Vacancies
Sponsored by
Senator Hough
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the method for filling a vacancy on the Frederick County Board of Education; specifying that an individual appointed to fill a vacancy serves for the remainder of a certain term and until a successor is elected and qualifies except that, under certain circumstances, the individual serves only until a successor is elected at the next general election; specifying how certain positions are to be filled at a general election; establishing the manner for nominating candidates for vacated offices; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0798
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0410 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Frederick County Board of Education – Vacancies
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {374035/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Frederick County Board of Education – Vacancies
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Frederick County Board of Education – Vacancies
Senate 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/03/2021 3/03/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/03/2021 3/03/2021 Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2021 3/29/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/29/2021 3/07/2021 Favorable with Amendments {374035/1 Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2021 3/07/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Frederick County Board of Education – Vacancies
Senate 3/30/2021 3/08/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/14/2021 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/2/2021 9:17 AM
Click to return on the top page