Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Veterans and Military Service Members and Spouses - Occupational Licenses
Sponsored by
Senators Griffith, Smith, Benson, Eckardt, Edwards, Ellis, Feldman, Hershey, Hester, Jennings, Miller, Peters, Reilly, Rosapepe, Zucker, and Simonaire
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 312
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "military spouse" to include the surviving spouse of a service member who dies at any time before an application for a license; altering the definition of "veteran" to include former service members who have been discharged for more than 1 year before an application for a license; requiring units of the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to issue a certain license to certain applicants within 60 days after receiving a completed application; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1386
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
21
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {394530/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 312
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Veterans and Military Service Members and Spouses - Occupational Licenses
Senate 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 21
Senate 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {394530/1 Adopted 44
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Veterans and Military Service Members and Spouses - Occupational Licenses
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 46A
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Referred Economic Matters 46A
House 3/22/2019 3/22/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 57
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 59
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 312
Text - Chapter - Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Veterans and Military Service Members and Spouses - Occupational Licenses
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2.5-101, 2.5-105, 2.5-107 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM