Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Police Officer Certification - Eligibility (Freedom to Serve Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Kagan, Augustine, Benson, Eckardt, Edwards, Elfreth, Ellis, Feldman, Ferguson, Griffith, Guzzone, Hayes, Kelley, King, Klausmeier, Kramer, Lam, Lee, McCray, Miller, Nathan-Pulliam, Patterson, Peters, Pinsky, Reilly, Rosapepe, Salling, Smith, Waldstreicher, Washington, West, Young, Zirkin, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 490
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the eligibility requirements for an individual to be certified by the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission as a police officer to require an individual to be a United States citizen or a permanent legal resident of the United States who is an honorably discharged veteran of the United States armed forces and who has applied to obtain United States citizenship and the application is pending approval; requiring the certification of a police officer who fails to obtain United States citizenship to be terminated; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0433
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0344 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {178772/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (107-30)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 490
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Police Officer Certification - Eligibility (Freedom to Serve Act)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments {178772/1 Adopted 47A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Police Officer Certification - Eligibility (Freedom to Serve Act)
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 48
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Judiciary 50
House 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/29/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Third Reading Passed (107-30) 58
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 490
Text - Chapter - Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Police Officer Certification - Eligibility (Freedom to Serve Act)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM