Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Lead - Risk Reduction Standard - Exemption for Affected Properties
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting an affected property from the risk reduction standard if the owner of the affected property has maintained a specified exemption certification for two consecutive certification periods and submits proof to the Department of the Environment; and requiring the owner of an affected property, in order to maintain a specified exemption from the risk reduction standard, to have the windows and specified surfaces tested for lead-contaminated dust every 5 years and submit a specified certification to the Department.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/24/2015 2/25/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/05/2015 3/06/2015 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-803, 6-804 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM