Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Frederick County - Development Rights and Responsibilities Agreements - Administrative Appeals
Sponsored by
Senators Young and Hough
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 442
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing, in Frederick County, a person aggrieved by a development rights and responsibilities agreement to file an administrative appeal; providing that if an agreement was entered into before July 1, 2016, a person aggrieved by an amendment to the agreement may not file an administrative appeal and may seek direct judicial review under specified circumstances; providing that a party may appeal to the Court of Special Appeals and thereafter may petition the Court of Appeals for a writ of certiorari under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0605
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-1)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 442
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/09/2016 3/10/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 42
Senate 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Second Reading Passed 42
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 44
House 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation 51
House 4/04/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 63
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed 63
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-1) 64
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 442
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-307 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM