Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Governor's Office of Minority Affairs - Workgroup on Reconciliation and Equity
Sponsored by
Senators Nathan-Pulliam, Benson, Conway, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Gladden, Guzzone, Kelley, King, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Muse, Peters, Pugh, Ramirez, Raskin, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor's Office of Minority Affairs to convene a workgroup to explore issues of reconciliation processes and racial equity that includes specified stakeholders; requiring the workgroup to hold hearings and evaluate specified issues relating to race and social justice, study racial disparities and institutional bias, and determine best practices, strategies, and legislation; and requiring the workgroup to submit a report to the Governor and General Assembly on or before December 1, 2019.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {764835/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Hearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/23/2016 3/25/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/25/2016 3/23/2016 Favorable with Amendments {764835/1 Report Adopted 52
Senate 3/25/2016 3/23/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 56
House 4/07/2016 4/07/2016 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Hearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM