Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Consumer Protections
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman, Guzzone, Hester, Klausmeier, Lam, Lee, Rosapepe, Augustine, Beidle, Benson, Carter, Hayes, Hettleman, Kelley, Washington, West, Young, Elfreth, Smith, and Kagan
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 621
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to enforce certain provisions of law under certain applicable powers; requiring the Commissioner to adopt certain regulations under certain circumstances that are consistent with certain federal regulations, rules, and guidance; prohibiting certain carriers from excluding or limiting certain benefits or denying certain coverage because a certain health condition was present on a certain date; etc.
Committees
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0959
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Insurance - Consumer Protections
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {847273/1
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator West) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {543229/1 (Senator West) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health Insurance - Consumer Protections
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-9)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Cullison) Adopted (128-4)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (106-25)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 621
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Health Insurance - Consumer Protections
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Health Insurance - Consumer Protections
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {847273/1 46
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Committee Amendment Adopted 46
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator West) Adopted 46
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 46
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Floor Amendment {543229/1 (Senator West) Adopted 46
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Health Insurance - Consumer Protections
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (36-9) 49
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 49
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Cullison) Adopted (128-4) 51
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (106-25) 51
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Returned Passed 53
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 621
Text - Chapter - Health Insurance - Consumer Protections
File Code
Subjects
Age
Statutes
(   15-137.1,   15-1A-01 through 15-1A-22 )
Last Updated: 7/9/2020 1:20 PM