Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Facilities - Hospitals - Medical Debt Protection
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman, Hershey, and Lam
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a hospital to annually submit a report to the Health Services Cost Review Commission on the total number of patients by race or ethnicity, gender, and zip code against whom the hospital has filed an action to collect a debt, or to whom the hospital has and has not reported or classified a bad debt, and the total amount of costs owed but not collected; requiring that a certain policy provide a mechanism to a patient to modify a payment plan and prohibit the hospital from collecting a certain debt for a certain patient; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1081
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Facilities - Hospitals - Medical Debt Protection
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health Facilities - Hospitals - Medical Debt Protection
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/6/2020 9:09 AM