Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Oil Disaster Containment, Clean-Up and Contingency Fund and Oil Contaminated Site Environmental Cleanup Fund
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the basis for calculating a specified license fee credited to the Maryland Oil Disaster Containment, Clean-Up and Contingency Fund; altering the date by which the Department of the Environment is required to report annually to specified subcommittees of the General Assembly; extending the deadline by which the owner of a specified eligible heating oil tank may apply for reimbursement of specified costs from the Oil Contaminated Site Environmental Cleanup Fund; requiring a specified annual status report; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {334431/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/07/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/16/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2013 3/16/2013 Favorable with Amendments {334431/1 Report Adopted 47
Senate 3/18/2013 3/16/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 49
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters 50
House 3/25/2013 3/25/2013 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
(   4-401, 4-411, 4-704, 4-705 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page