Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Residential Property - Notice of Foreclosure
Sponsored by
Senator Kelley
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 348
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a person authorized to sell residential property subject to foreclosure to file a notice of foreclosure with the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation under certain circumstances; establishing that a notice of foreclosure may be filed through the Foreclosed Property Registry; establishing that the notice of foreclosure contain specified information; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1048
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Residential Property - Notice of Foreclosure
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {738971/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Residential Property - Notice of Foreclosure
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 348
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Residential Property - Notice of Foreclosure
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Residential Property - Notice of Foreclosure
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable with Amendments {738971/1 Adopted 55
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Text - Third - Residential Property - Notice of Foreclosure
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 56
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 61
House 4/04/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 66
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 348
Text - Chapter - Residential Property - Notice of Foreclosure
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-126.1, 14-126.2, 14-126.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM