Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability Act
Sponsored by
Senator Zucker
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 833
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "campaign material" to include certain material that is disseminated and certain qualifying paid digital communications; altering the definition of "public communication" to include certain qualifying paid digital communications that require a person who makes independent expenditures of a certain amount to file an independent expenditure report with the State Board; requiring, under certain circumstances, an online platform to apply for a compliance waiver before receiving a certain payment; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0981
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {724431/1
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {724431/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {553421/1 (Senator Zucker) Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-1)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
4/07/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {115762/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-40)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2018
Legislative Date
5/26/2018
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 833
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability Act
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability Act
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments {724431/1 57
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 57
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {724431/1 Adopted 58
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Floor Amendment {553421/1 (Senator Zucker) Adopted 58
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Text - Third - Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability Act
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-1) 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 59
House 4/04/2018 4/05/2018 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/07/2018 4/07/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable with Amendments {115762/1 Adopted 64
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (95-40) 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 65
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (41-0) 65
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability Act
Post Passage 5/26/2018 5/26/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 833
Text - Chapter - Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 13-306, 13-307, 13-401, 13-403, 13-405, 13-405.1, 13-405.2 )
Last Updated: 1/23/2020 7:44 PM