Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Law - Dispositions - Placement Guidance
Sponsored by
Senator Jackson
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Modifying the circumstances under which the juvenile court is prohibited from committing a child to the Department of Juvenile Services for out-of-home placement.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1028
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Dispositions - Placement Guidance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing 3/03 at 12:00 p.m.
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Dispositions - Placement Guidance
Senate 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:26 PM
Click to return on the top page