Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Video Lottery Terminals - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Allocation of Funds
Sponsored by
Senators Peters, Beidle, Griffith, Guzzone, Hershey, Jennings, Reilly, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the allocation of funds from the Racetrack Facility Renewal Account by adding the Bowie Race Course Training Center to the list of thoroughbred racing facilities eligible to receive the funds.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1070
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Video Lottery Terminals - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Allocation of Funds
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable Adopted 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Second Reading Passed 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Video Lottery Terminals - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Allocation of Funds
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Ways and Means 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page