Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

SB0878


CH0623

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Worcester County - Special Event Zones - Prohibitions
Sponsored by
Senators Carozza, Hershey, Miller, Peters, and West
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 623
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from engaging in exhibition driving within a special event zone in Worcester County; prohibiting a person from committing certain violations of the Maryland Vehicle Law within a special event zone in Worcester County; defining "exhibition driving" to include the operation of a vehicle in a manner that produces abrupt acceleration or deceleration, skidding, swerving, raucous engine noise, gear grinding, or wheels losing contact with the ground; establishing certain penalties for violations of the Act; etc.
Committees
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB1493
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Worcester County - Special Event Zones - Prohibitions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
21
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {408875/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Worcester County - Special Event Zones - Prohibitions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-1)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 623
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Worcester County - Special Event Zones - Prohibitions
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings 21
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments {408875/1 Adopted 48
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Worcester County - Special Event Zones - Prohibitions
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 49
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Environment and Transportation 49A
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51A
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Third Reading Passed (131-1) 53
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 623
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:34 PM