Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - School Resource Officers - Firearms Required
Sponsored by
Senators Jennings, Bailey, Eckardt, Edwards, Gallion, Hershey, Hough, Ready, Reilly, Salling, and Serafini
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) and Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a Baltimore City school police officer and a school resource officer to carry a firearm while present on the premises of the school to which the officer is assigned.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Schools - School Resource Officers - Firearms Required
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) and Hearing 3/12 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) and Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) and Hearing 3/12 at 9:30 a.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) and Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Public Schools - School Resource Officers - Firearms Required
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) and Hearing 3/12 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) and Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings)
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) and Hearing 3/12 at 9:30 a.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) and Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-318, 7-1501, 7-1508 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM