Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Flat Tax
Sponsored by
Senator Serafini
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the State income tax rate to 3.8% for individuals with Maryland taxable income in excess of $30,000; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2015.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1123
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0328 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/02/2015 3/02/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/05/2015 3/06/2015 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
3/03/2015 Text - First - Income Tax - Flat Tax
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM