Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education Funding and Formulas - Amendment - Supermajority Vote
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the alteration of specified education related formulas, distributions, and funds unless approved by the General Assembly through legislation passed by a three-fifths majority vote of the full standing committee assigned the legislation in each of the two Houses of the General Assembly and enacted into law; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/02/2015 3/02/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/05/2015 3/06/2015 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Hearing 3/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-219, 8-320, 8-420, 8-711 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM