Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches - Relationship with Dealers
Sponsored by
Senator Stone
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting, except under specified circumstances, a manufacturer, distributor, or factory branch from requiring, attempting to require, coercing, or attempting to coerce a dealer to purchase specified goods or services from specified vendors; requiring a manufacturer, distributor, or factory branch licensed in the State to specify in writing to its motor vehicle dealers information relating to the compensation of dealers for parts and labor; establishing requirements for the compensation of dealers with respect to parts and labor; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1139
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {708677/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/06/2013 3/07/2013 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/04/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments {708677/1 Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-207, 15-212 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM