Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax Credit – Business Entities – State of Emergency
Sponsored by
Senators Elfreth and Simonaire
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City or the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to grant a tax credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on real or personal property owned or leased by a business entity affected by a state of emergency declared under Title 14 of the Public Safety Article; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2021; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1137
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Property Tax Credit – Business Entities – State of Emergency
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Property Tax Credit – Business Entities – State of Emergency
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
35AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
4/06/2021
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
4/08/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Property Tax Credit – Business Entities – State of Emergency
Senate 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/31/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable Adopted 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/09/2021 Second Reading Passed 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Property Tax Credit – Business Entities – State of Emergency
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 3/16/2021 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 35AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 4/06/2021 Rereferred to Ways and Means
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 4/08/2021 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/10/2021 5:06 PM
Click to return on the top page