Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Dorchester County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Muzzle Loader Season
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 193
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to allow a person to hunt deer on private property on Sundays during the deer muzzle loader season in Dorchester County, subject to certain provisions of law.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0619
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Dorchester County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Muzzle Loader Season
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {294533/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Dorchester County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Muzzle Loader Season
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (129-9)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 193
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Dorchester County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Muzzle Loader Season
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Dorchester County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Muzzle Loader Season
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 10:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/22/2019 3/22/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable with Amendments {294533/1 Adopted 52
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Text - Third - Dorchester County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Muzzle Loader Season
Senate 3/25/2019 3/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 53
House 3/26/2019 3/18/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 53A
House 3/28/2019 3/29/2019 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (129-9) 65
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 193
Text - Chapter - Dorchester County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Muzzle Loader Season
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM