Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health – Cyber Safety Handbook – Handbook Development and Publication
Sponsored by
Senator Hester
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education, the Maryland Department of Health, and the Behavioral Health Administration jointly to develop and publish a certain handbook regarding safe Internet, social media, and technology usage for certain students, parents, and teachers on or before July 1, 2021; requiring the handbook to include certain information and best practices; requiring certain agencies to consult with certain professionals when developing a certain handbook; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
47B
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Health – Cyber Safety Handbook – Handbook Development and Publication
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable Adopted 45
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Second Reading Passed 45
Text - Third - Public Health – Cyber Safety Handbook – Handbook Development and Publication
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 47B
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:25 PM