Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation - Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices - Revisions
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Augustine, Beidle, Benson, Feldman, Hayes, and Kramer
Status
In the House - First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring certain licensees to post a certain sign in a certain location; altering the minimum age, from 18 to 21, for an individual to purchase or be sold tobacco products; authorizing the Maryland Department of Health to conduct certain inspections of licensed retailers; authorizing the Department to use individuals under the age of 21 years to assist in conducting a certain inspection; exempting certain individuals from a certain minimum age requirement for an individual to purchase or be sold tobacco products; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1169
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {647779/1
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {647779/1
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {763928/2 (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {243926/1 (Senator Ready)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Kelley) Adopted
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {243926/1 (Senator Ready)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {243926/1 (Senator Ready) Withdrawn
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {243926/3 (Senator Ready) Rejected
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (35-11)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Economic Matters Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
50
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Business Regulation - Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices - Revisions
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {647779/1 45
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted 45
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments {647779/1 46
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Committee Amendment Adopted 46
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ready) Adopted 46
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 46A
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Floor Amendment {763928/2 (Senator Hough) Adopted 46A
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Floor Amendment {243926/1 (Senator Ready) 46A
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Motion Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Kelley) Adopted 46A
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Floor Amendment {243926/1 (Senator Ready) 47
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ready) Adopted 47
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Floor Amendment {243926/1 (Senator Ready) Withdrawn 47
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Floor Amendment {243926/3 (Senator Ready) Rejected 47
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - Business Regulation - Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices - Revisions
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (35-11) 48
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Economic Matters Health and Government Operations 50
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16.5-214.1, 16.5-217.1, 16.7-101, 16.7-102, 16.7-201 through 16.7-204, 16.7-204.1, 16.7-206, 16.7-207, 16.7-209, 16.7-211, 16.7-213, 16.7-213.1, 16-209, 16-302, 16-308.2, 16-3A-01, 16-3A-02 )
(   10-101, 10-107, 10-108 )
(   13-1001, 13-1015, 24-305, 24-307 )
(   1-1201, 1-1203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM